open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00265
    Party Name:Lewis et al v. First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [First Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47223
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =