U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00256-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bush
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to Self Report]
  • November 19, 2020: [Extend Time To Self Report]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to Self Report]
  • October 14, 2020: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extend Time To Self Report]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 24, 2020: [Witness List]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Pretrial]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 10, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 02, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 21, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • November 01, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • October 23, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice Of Intent To Request Redaction]
  • October 09, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Transcript]
  • October 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 01, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • October 01, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.