U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00255-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hudson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Dismiss]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Reconsideration]
  • February 20, 2020: [Reply To Response]
  • February 20, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Response To Court Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Suppress]
  • February 11, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 11, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 11, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • February 07, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 06, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2020: [Response In Opposition]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • January 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2020: [Suppress]
  • January 27, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 27, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2020: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • January 22, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice Of Intent To Request Redaction]
  • January 06, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 02, 2020: [Transcript Request]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • November 22, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Waiver Of Interstate Agreement On Detainers]
  • November 14, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 25, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2019: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • October 02, 2019: [Standing (Administrative) Order for Judge Berger]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 01, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • October 01, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.