U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 31, 2022: [Detain]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • October 24, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
  • October 05, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • September 08, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • July 20, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 28, 2022: [Transfer Out - Probationer or Supervised Release]
  • March 24, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • March 09, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • January 28, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
  • January 26, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • December 01, 2021: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judgment for Revocation]
  • October 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • October 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Vacate (2255)]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • September 08, 2021: [PROB 12C Petition for Warrant or Summons - Supervised Offender]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 25, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • July 12, 2021: [Detain]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Per Curiam]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Return Receipt]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Judgment for Revocation]
  • April 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 08, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 23, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 15, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • March 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • March 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 24, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • February 10, 2021: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • February 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Return Receipt]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [Request to Discontinue E-mail Notification]
  • January 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 27, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • January 11, 2021: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • January 06, 2021: [Return Receipt]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Public Motion]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 23, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Transcript Purchase Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 21, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 15, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 15, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 15, 2020: [Detain]
  • December 04, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Release from Custody]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • November 16, 2020: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • November 16, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 05, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 05, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 04, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 29, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [USCA Records Request]
  • September 03, 2020: [Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • August 11, 2020: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Witness List]
  • August 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 10, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 06, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • July 20, 2020: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • July 13, 2020: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • June 26, 2020: [Transcript Purchase Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Witness List]
  • June 25, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 25, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • June 25, 2020: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • June 25, 2020: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • June 25, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 23, 2020: [Objections]
  • June 23, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
  • June 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 18, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • June 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • May 28, 2020: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 26, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • May 26, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 21, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • May 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 20, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 20, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • May 19, 2020: [Witness List]
  • May 19, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 14, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 13, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 03, 2020: [Transcript]
  • April 03, 2020: [Expedite]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 18, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 18, 2020: [Bond]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • March 05, 2020: [Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2020: [Bond]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 25, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 25, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • February 24, 2020: [PS 42 Consent to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 18, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 18, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 18, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • February 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Revoke]
  • February 05, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 31, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 29, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • January 28, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Objections]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • January 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 14, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 08, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • January 08, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 07, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2020: [Detain]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • December 19, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • December 18, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Petition]
  • December 10, 2019: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • December 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Petition]
  • December 03, 2019: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Petition]
  • November 22, 2019: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • November 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2019: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • November 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Detain]
  • November 20, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • November 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Petition]
  • November 14, 2019: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • November 14, 2019: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • November 14, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Bond]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 06, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • November 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 28, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 28, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 24, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Oral Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Detain]
  • October 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Bond]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 16, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Petition]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 10, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 04, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Bond]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2019: [Oral Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Withdraw]
  • October 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2019: [Detain]
  • October 03, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • October 02, 2019: [Bond]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 02, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 01, 2019: [To Seal]
  • October 01, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.