U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Holloway et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 29, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 29, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 17, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • March 23, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Arraignment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • February 26, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • February 26, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • February 07, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • January 07, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • January 07, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 07, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order]
  • December 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • December 04, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 04, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 17, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 08, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 03, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.