U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00247-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Cochran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Exhibits In Support]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Directing Government To Respond To A Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • December 22, 2022: [Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
  • December 22, 2022: [2255 - Motion To Vacate, Set Aside Or Correct Sentence]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Docket Annotation (PUBLIC)]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Response In Support]
  • July 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Sealed Document - (SEALED - Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Certificate Of Service]
  • June 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Leave to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Leave To File Document]
  • March 31, 2022: [Certificate Of Service]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 16, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Appear]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • January 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Proof Of Service By Publication]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • October 08, 2021: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Reply To Response]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 30, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • August 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
  • August 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Response In Opposition]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Directing Government To Respond To A Motion]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2021: [Response In Opposition]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension Of Time To File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
May, 2021
  • May 22, 2021: [Response In Opposition]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to Self Report]
  • April 30, 2021: [Response In Opposition]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport - Notice of Disposition]
  • April 29, 2021: [Extend Time To Self Report]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Of 4CCA Appointing FPD]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • April 13, 2021: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2021: [Response To Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Directing Government To Respond To A Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • March 30, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Witness List]
  • March 12, 2021: [Modify Conditions Of Release]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2021: [Sealed Motion (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2021: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Response To Motion]
  • February 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing Scheduled - Continued]
  • February 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Exceed Page Limit]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 15, 2021: [Exceed Page Limit (Do not use for Motion for Leave to File)]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 03, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 03, 2020: [Proposed Order]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • September 22, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • September 21, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 15, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 03, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 02, 2019: [Transcript Request]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Response In Opposition]
  • November 21, 2019: [Modify Conditions Of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Clerk's Order Reassigning Cases to Judge Volk]
  • October 21, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • October 15, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice Regarding US Passport - Original Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.