U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00263-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Daugherty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Granting Notice Of Dismissal]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice Of Dismissal by USA]
  • December 06, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 14, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • November 12, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • October 09, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.