U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00262-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice Of Transfer To Another Jurisdiction]
  • February 24, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 08, 2021: [Release From Custody]
  • January 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
  • December 08, 2020: [Release From Custody]
  • December 02, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 06, 2020: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 14, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • January 14, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 25, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 25, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.