U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00261-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • January 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 13, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • January 13, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 13, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • November 25, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • November 20, 2019: [Waiver Of Right]
  • November 20, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.