U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Killian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 09, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • October 09, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.