U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:91-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [USCA Order]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [USCA Records Request]
  • January 14, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 13, 2020: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • January 13, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [USCA Records Request]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Return Receipt]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2019: [Return Receipt]
  • October 22, 2019: [Return Receipt]
  • October 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Vacate (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.