U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00203-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Mullins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Mandate]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • August 03, 2022: [Opinion]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 03, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • November 23, 2020: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 19, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 04, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 04, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • August 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 17, 2020: [Witness List]
  • August 17, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • August 17, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Suppress]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 31, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2020: [Response In Support]
  • July 27, 2020: [Response To Motion]
  • July 21, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Suppress]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 12, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 24, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • February 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 13, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 12, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Pretrial]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • October 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2019: [Bond]
  • October 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 10, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 10, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.