U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Workman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Court Fee Paid]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.