U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yoho
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 26, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • October 13, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Request to Discontinue E-mail Notification]
  • October 06, 2021: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Detain]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • March 26, 2021: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • February 04, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 04, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • November 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 23, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 20, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 20, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 02, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 27, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 31, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • January 27, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2020: [Bond]
  • January 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Paperless Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • January 08, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2020: [Paperless Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Bond]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 05, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • December 05, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.