U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00259-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Tyner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 13, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • December 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 07, 2020: [Witness List]
  • December 07, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • December 07, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Suppress]
  • September 02, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • September 01, 2020: [Witness List]
  • September 01, 2020: [Exhibit List]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Response To Motion]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2020: [Suppress]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 02, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • December 04, 2019: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice Of Intent To Request Redaction]
  • November 13, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Witness List]
  • October 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.