U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moran et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2022: [Other Document]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 27, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 29, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order (SEALED)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 30, 2022: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 29, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Detain]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • March 29, 2022: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order (SEALED)]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 28, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 28, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 28, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 28, 2021: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • May 28, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Other Document]
  • May 24, 2021: [Other Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Other Document]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 23, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • January 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 11, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • November 04, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • October 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2020: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 26, 2020: [Bond]
  • March 26, 2020: [Other Document]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 17, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Other Document]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 29, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • January 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 06, 2020: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • January 06, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 06, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Other Document]
  • January 02, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Other Document]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Detain]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Other Document]
  • October 24, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 22, 2019: [Detain]
  • October 22, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.