open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00800
    Party Name:Wolfe v. American Electric Power Company, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding COVID-19 General Order #3]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Chambers Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report Of Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Unexecuted By Secretary of State]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Chambers's Order and Notice]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer To Complaint]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Extending Time]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?228244
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =