U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00275-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Nguyen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 14, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Return Of Service On Subpoena]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 14, 2022: [Return Of Service On Subpoena]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing On Petition For Warrant Or Summons For Offender Under Supervison]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Mandate]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 11, 2020: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order Of 4CCA Appointing FPD]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • August 26, 2020: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 29, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • January 06, 2020: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • January 03, 2020: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • December 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.