open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-bk-20508
    Party Name:Timothy Lee Pride and Cynthia Diane Pride
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Adequate Protection]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Lift/Modify/Terminate Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Request for Notices Under BR 2002(g)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Transfer Divisional Venue (no pdf)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Transfer Divisional Venue]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Transfer Divisional Venue]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Pay Statement (Debtor's Statement in Lieu of Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Statement (Debtor's Statement in Lieu of Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?122151
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =