open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00305
    Party Name:Bumpass v. Howard et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Appeal Fees]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return Receipt]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Roseboro Notice]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [First Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Other Document]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47624
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =