open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00802
    Party Name:J&B Investments, LLC v. Community Trust Bank
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding COVID-19 General Order #3]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate Of Service]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Volk's Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Cancelling Deadline]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report Of Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer To Complaint Attached To Notice Of Removal]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Volks's Order and Notice]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Removal]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?228248
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =