open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00801
    Party Name:Mills v. Ames
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply To Response]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response In Opposition]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Stay]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Extend Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time To File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum In Support]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response To Court Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return Receipt Card (Generic)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion And R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Or Costs]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [2254 Notice]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay - General]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (2254)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?228247
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =