U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00285-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Clay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 09, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 09, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • February 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 27, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 27, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • February 27, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.