U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00286-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 18, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • June 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 11, 2020: [Exhibits From Court Hearing - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry; No Document Access)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • March 11, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • February 20, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 05, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 08, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 10, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 02, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 20, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • November 20, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.