U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Batres-Ruiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 09, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 16, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • December 05, 2019: [Detain]
  • December 05, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.