U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00296-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Boggess
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Supervision]
  • March 07, 2022: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 13, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 01, 2021: [Modify Conditions Of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Response To Motion]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Dismiss]
  • January 07, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Reply To Response]
  • November 06, 2020: [Response To Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension Of Time To File Response/Reply]
  • October 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Pretrial]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 07, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Suppress]
  • March 05, 2020: [Memorandum In Support]
  • March 02, 2020: [Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 20, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 20, 2020: [Pre-Trial Motion Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • February 14, 2020: [Response To Motion]
  • February 14, 2020: [Response In Opposition]
  • February 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 06, 2020: [Suppress]
  • February 05, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 06, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • January 06, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
  • December 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.