U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jeffrey L. Hodgens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 29, 2020: [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2020: [Bond]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Pretrial]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.