U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00299-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Meds2Go Express Pharmacy, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 03, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 03, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • May 26, 2020: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 21, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2019: [Bond]
  • December 19, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • December 19, 2019: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • December 19, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 09, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.