U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 27, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 27, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • August 26, 2021: [Witness List]
  • August 26, 2021: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • August 17, 2021: [Response In Opposition]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 28, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing On Petition For Warrant Or Summons For Offender Under Supervison]
  • July 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • April 28, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • April 28, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • March 18, 2021: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • March 18, 2021: [Opinion]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Supervision]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Response To Motion]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • July 23, 2020: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice Of Intent To Request Redaction]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 25, 2020: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order Of 4CCA Appointing FPD]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • June 10, 2020: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 03, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • May 28, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • May 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • January 30, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • January 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 30, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • December 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • December 10, 2019: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.