U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Mandate]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • December 19, 2022: [Opinion]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • August 27, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Exhibits In Support]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • April 13, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • February 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2021: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Recusal]
  • December 29, 2020: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • December 03, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 20, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 08, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 07, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • December 10, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.