U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00301-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Joseph Micheal King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 23, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • December 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 11, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • December 11, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.