U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Darby et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 18, 2022: [USCA Per Curiam]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Records Request]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 05, 2022: [Envelope Received]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 15, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
  • March 09, 2022: [Transcript Purchase Order]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Public Motion]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 22, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Transcript Purchase Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • February 15, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • February 15, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • February 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Envelope Received]
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Objections]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 12, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • April 19, 2021: [PS 42 Consent to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 14, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • April 13, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 13, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • April 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2021: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 02, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: [Petition (SEALED)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • February 05, 2021: [PS 42 Consent to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order to Seal Document]
  • February 04, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • February 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Suppress]
  • January 26, 2021: [Objections]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 13, 2021: [Bond]
  • January 04, 2021: [Other Document]
  • January 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • November 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 12, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 12, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 12, 2020: [Oral Motion]
  • November 11, 2020: [Other Document]
  • November 10, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued ]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2020: [Other Document]
  • November 09, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 04, 2020: [Bond]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Witness List]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Bond]
  • August 06, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 28, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 22, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2020: [Other Document]
  • July 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 03, 2020: [Suppress]
  • July 02, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued ]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • June 23, 2020: [Witness List]
  • June 22, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 01, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 01, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 28, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 26, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • May 26, 2020: [Witness List]
  • May 26, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 26, 2020: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • May 26, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Bond]
  • April 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • February 20, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 14, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 14, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 13, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 12, 2020: [Bond]
  • February 11, 2020: [Other Document]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2020: [PS 42 Consent to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 21, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 21, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 17, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • January 13, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Other Document]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 08, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Other Document]
  • January 07, 2020: [Response (NOT TO MOTION)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 29, 2019: [Withdraw]
  • December 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 18, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Petition]
  • December 17, 2019: [PS 42 Consent to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Detain]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Detain]
  • December 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.