U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swift
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 20, 2023: [Return Receipt]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Public Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order (PUBLIC)]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 08, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 20, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • September 03, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 30, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 19, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2020: [Return Receipt]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2020: [Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 31, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 31, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 16, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.