U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00288-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order Granting Notice Of Dismissal]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice Of Dismissal by USA]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Suppress]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Motion]
  • February 26, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Reply To Response]
  • February 24, 2020: [Response To Motion]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 12, 2020: [Memorandum In Support]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Motion]
  • February 07, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 07, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 06, 2020: [Pre-Trial Motion Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • January 29, 2020: [Response In Opposition]
  • January 23, 2020: [Suppress]
  • January 10, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • January 07, 2020: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 26, 2019: [Response In Opposition]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 19, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.