U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00302-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 05, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • July 02, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2020: [Withdraw As Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • March 02, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • February 24, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 23, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.