U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kokinda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Release from Custody]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 09, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Public Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2022: [Joinder]
  • May 09, 2022: [Suppress]
  • May 05, 2022: [Joinder]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • April 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Witness List]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2022: [Suppress]
  • March 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 17, 2022: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 22, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • February 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order (SEALED)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2022: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 13, 2022: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • December 20, 2021: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • December 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 16, 2021: [Objections]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 06, 2021: [Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 03, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 18, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 18, 2021: [Witness List]
  • October 17, 2021: [Withdraw]
  • October 16, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 14, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • October 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 12, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Objections]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 17, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 10, 2021: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Separate Trial on Counts]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • September 01, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • August 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2021: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Strike]
  • June 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 15, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 29, 2021: [USCA Per Curiam]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • March 30, 2021: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 26, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • March 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Separate Trial on Counts]
  • March 17, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • March 15, 2021: [Other Document]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Bill of Particulars]
  • March 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 11, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Suppress]
  • March 04, 2021: [Other Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Return Receipt]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Add Counts - Superseding Indictment]
  • February 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 22, 2021: [Compel]
  • February 22, 2021: [Objections]
  • February 22, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • February 19, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • February 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • February 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • February 08, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • February 05, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 03, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • February 02, 2021: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • January 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 29, 2021: [Response (NOT TO MOTION)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • January 28, 2021: [Objections]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • January 25, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 21, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 21, 2021: [Witness List]
  • January 21, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • January 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 11, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • January 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2021: [Memorandum]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • December 17, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • December 17, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response (NOT TO MOTION)]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 16, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • December 15, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • December 08, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • December 08, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • December 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • November 18, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • November 18, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Public Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 10, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 09, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • November 05, 2020: [Mail Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
  • October 08, 2020: [Psychiatric Report]
  • October 06, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • September 08, 2020: [Return Receipt]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 10, 2020: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
  • August 07, 2020: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 01, 2020: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • July 01, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 01, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 01, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
  • June 25, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 23, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
  • June 09, 2020: [Hearing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • June 02, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • June 02, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 12, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Objections]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • April 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • April 28, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • April 08, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2020: [Return Receipt]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Bill of Particulars]
  • March 31, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • March 31, 2020: [Suppress]
  • March 24, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 20, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 17, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Compel]
  • March 05, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • March 03, 2020: [Return Receipt]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Oral Motion]
  • February 21, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 10, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • February 10, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • February 07, 2020: [Other Document]
  • February 06, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 06, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 29, 2020: [Paperless Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 29, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detain]
  • January 15, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 13, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.