U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00305-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Childress
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • January 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • November 12, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 24, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 22, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • June 08, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Supervision]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • December 18, 2019: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 17, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.