U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Donaldson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [USCA Per Curiam]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Transcript Purchase Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • December 01, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 18, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2021: [Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 24, 2021: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
  • June 24, 2021: [Transcript]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Return of Exhibits]
  • April 21, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • April 21, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • April 21, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Jury Selection]
  • April 21, 2021: [Voir Dire]
  • April 21, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • April 16, 2021: [Other Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 15, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • April 15, 2021: [Other Document]
  • April 14, 2021: [Other Document]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 12, 2021: [Other Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 09, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Other Document]
  • April 05, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order to Seal Document]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 19, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 19, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 19, 2020: [Other Document]
  • October 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Other Document]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 01, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 27, 2020: [Detain]
  • August 27, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 27, 2020: [Paperless Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Indictment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.