U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 07, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Witness List]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Other Document]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 07, 2021: [Envelope Received]
  • January 07, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • December 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • October 05, 2020: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 27, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • April 15, 2020: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2020: [Paperless Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.