U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:04-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Carlisle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Adopting Proposed Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Expedite]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.