U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Supervision]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 10, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • March 03, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • March 03, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2020: [Bond]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Volk]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 23, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.