U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gossett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • January 24, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order for Warrant]
  • January 23, 2020: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • January 23, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.