U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Knight
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 08, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 31, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 29, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 06, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 02, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • March 13, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 11, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 02, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 24, 2020: [Certificate Of Service]
  • February 10, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 10, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Waiver Of Interstate Agreement On Detainers]
  • February 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 30, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2020: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • January 24, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order for Warrant]
  • January 23, 2020: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • January 23, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.