U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Adkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Criminal Debt Payment]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • May 03, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • February 04, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • January 27, 2022: [Memorandum In Support]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response In Opposition]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Directing Government To Respond To A Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Certificate Of Service]
  • January 13, 2022: [Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Answer To Writ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • July 02, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • February 26, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 22, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 21, 2021: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 21, 2021: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Response To Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order Directing Government To Respond To A Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Sealed Motion (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
  • January 11, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Exhibits In Support]
  • September 25, 2020: [Reply To Response]
  • September 22, 2020: [Memorandum In Opposition]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 19, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Memorandum In Opposition]
  • August 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Leave to File Document]
  • August 13, 2020: [Leave To File Document]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Seal]
  • August 10, 2020: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Pretrial]
  • February 19, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • February 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 19, 2020: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • February 19, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • February 19, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 18, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Bond]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 24, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.