U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Swisher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order Granting Notice Of Dismissal]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice Of Dismissal by USA]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Seal]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 29, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 06, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • March 05, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 30, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2020: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.