U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Of 4CCA Appointing FPD]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • September 21, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 21, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion And R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw Document]
  • February 23, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • February 22, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 22, 2022: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • February 14, 2022: [Response In Opposition]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 07, 2022: [In Limine]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 19, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 25, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 20, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • September 09, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 28, 2020: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 28, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • January 29, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.