U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Holmes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 23, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • March 23, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • December 01, 2020: [Witness List]
  • December 01, 2020: [Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2020: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order for Warrant]
  • January 29, 2020: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • January 29, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.