U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 29, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • January 29, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.