U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:07-cr-00235-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Myers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 06, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order for Warrant]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Waiver Of Right]
  • February 05, 2020: [Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • January 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 30, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.