U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hirst
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 22, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 01, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2022: [Response To Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to Self Report]
  • July 10, 2020: [Response In Opposition]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extend Time To Self Report]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • June 12, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 11, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 11, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2020: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • February 10, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 10, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 30, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.